TX HB3357 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to civil liability for obscenity.
Title
Relating to civil liability for obscenity.
Sponsors
Rep. Nate Schatzline [R] | Rep. Terri Leo-Wilson [R] | Rep. Ben Bumgarner [R] | Rep. Richard Hayes [R] |
Rep. Carrie Isaac [R] | Rep. Jared Patterson [R] | Rep. Lynn Stucky [R] | Rep. Kronda Thimesch [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-11 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-09 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-05-09 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-05-03 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-05-03 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-05-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-12 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-12 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-12 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-15 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2023-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-02 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
COMPUTERS & SOFTWARE
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Electronic Information Systems
INTERNET
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
Business & Commerce--General
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
COMPUTERS & SOFTWARE
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Electronic Information Systems
INTERNET
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against