TX HB3362 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-06 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-06 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to active shooter training for peace officers.
Title
Relating to active shooter training for peace officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-06 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2023-05-06 | House | Companion considered in lieu of SB 1852 |
2023-05-06 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2023-05-03 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2023-04-27 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2023-04-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-13 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-13 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2023-04-13 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-13 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-15 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2023-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1477 (Same As) 2023-03-16 - Referred to Criminal Justice
SB1477 (Same As) 2023-03-16 - Referred to Criminal Justice
SB1852 (Similar To) 2023-05-19 - Effective on 9/1/23
SB1477 (Same As) 2023-03-16 - Referred to Criminal Justice
SB1852 (Similar To) 2023-05-19 - Effective on 9/1/23
Subjects
Law Enforcement
LAW ENFORCEMENT, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PEACE OFFICERS
TEXAS STATE UNIVERSITY
TEXAS STATE UNIVERSITY--SAN MARCOS
Weapons
LAW ENFORCEMENT, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PEACE OFFICERS
TEXAS STATE UNIVERSITY
TEXAS STATE UNIVERSITY--SAN MARCOS
Weapons