TX HB3372 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-04 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Status: Introduced on March 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-04 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Summary
Relating to certain inmates entering certain pleas by mail or certain secure electronic transmissions.
Title
Relating to certain inmates entering certain pleas by mail or certain secure electronic transmissions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-04 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-02 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-02 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-28 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-28 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-28 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-16 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-16 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-16 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-16 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-16 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-18 | Referred to Corrections | |
2009-03-18 | Read first time | |
2009-03-11 | Filed |
Subjects
Corrections
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
TELECONFERENCING
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
TELECONFERENCING