TX HB3388 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-8)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Conf. Comm. Report distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the reimbursement of prescription drugs under Medicaid and the child health plan program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the reimbursement of prescription drugs under Medicaid and the child health plan program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1010 (Y: 136 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2019-05-25SenateConference committee report filed
2019-05-24HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2019-05-24HouseSenate grants request for conf comm-reported
2019-05-24SenateSenate appoints conferees
2019-05-24SenateSenate grants request for conference comm.
2019-05-24SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2019-05-24SenateHouse requests conference committee-reported
2019-05-24SenateHouse refuses to concur-reported
2019-05-24HouseHouse appoints conferees
2019-05-24HouseHouse requests conference committee
2019-05-24HouseHouse refuses to concur in Senate amendments
2019-05-23HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-23HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-22HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenatePassed
2019-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2019-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22SenateAmended
2019-05-22SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Kolkhorst
2019-05-22SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-22SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2019-05-22SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-21SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-20SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-20SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-17SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-17SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-14SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-05-14SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-14SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-14SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-14SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-10SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2019-05-10SenateRead first time
2019-05-06SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-04HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-03HouseRecord vote RV#1010
2019-05-03HousePassed
2019-05-03HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-02HousePassed to engrossment
2019-05-02HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-01HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-29HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-26HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-26HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-25HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-17HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-17HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-17HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-03HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-03HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-03HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-03HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-18HouseReferred to Public Health
2019-03-18HouseRead first time
2019-03-06HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB2262 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - Referred to Finance

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback