TX HB3396 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-17 - Companion considered in lieu of in committee
Pending: House Culture, Recreation & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-17 - Companion considered in lieu of in committee
Pending: House Culture, Recreation & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authorization of a fee for participation in the Managed Lands Deer Program.
Title
Relating to the authorization of a fee for participation in the Managed Lands Deer Program.
Sponsors
Rep. John Cyrier [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | House | Companion considered in lieu of in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-02 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism |
2019-03-18 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB733 (Same As) 2019-06-04 - Effective immediately
Subjects
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
Parks & Wildlife
PARKS & WILDLIFE COMMISSION
PARKS & WILDLIFE DEPARTMENT
Parks & Wildlife--Hunting & Fishing
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
Parks & Wildlife
PARKS & WILDLIFE COMMISSION
PARKS & WILDLIFE DEPARTMENT
Parks & Wildlife--Hunting & Fishing
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB3396 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB03396I.htm |