TX HB343 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 1/1/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 1/1/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the filing of financial disclosure statements by trustees of certain independent school districts; providing criminal and civil penalties.
Title
Relating to the filing of financial disclosure statements by trustees of certain independent school districts; providing criminal and civil penalties.
Sponsors
Rep. Marisa Marquez [D] | Rep. Naomi Gonzalez [D] | Rep. Joseph Moody [D] | Sen. Pat Fallon [R] |
Rep. Joe Pickett [D] | Sen. Jose Rodriguez [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-21 - House - HB 343Third Reading House (Y: 141 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - House - HB 343Third Reading House (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - House - HB 343Third Reading House (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective on 1/1/14 | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-23 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-22 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-21 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-21 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2013-05-21 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2013-05-21 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-21 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-21 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2013-05-18 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2013-05-18 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2013-05-17 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Passed |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-05-03 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-05-02 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-02 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-02 | House | Passed |
2013-05-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-02 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-02 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2013-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-02 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2013-05-01 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2013-04-25 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-16 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-16 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-04-16 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2013-04-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-09 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-09 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-02 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-02 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-02 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-02 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-11 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2013-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-03 | House | Filed |