TX HB3544 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Summary
Relating to the standards, methods, and procedures used by governmental bodies in taking certain actions and managing certain information, including standards, methods, and procedures relating to electronic notices by the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality, electronically stored information provided by a governmental body, confidentiality of e-mail addresses provided to a governmental body, and determinations regarding whether property is pollution control property for ad valorem tax purposes.
Title
Relating to the standards, methods, and procedures used by governmental bodies in taking certain actions and managing certain information, including standards, methods, and procedures relating to electronic notices by the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality, electronically stored information provided by a governmental body, confidentiality of e-mail addresses provided to a governmental body, and determinations regarding whether property is pollution control property for ad valorem tax purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Fraser [R] | Rep. Eddie Lucio [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective on 9/1/09 | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-27 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-27 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-26 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-26 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported | |
2009-05-25 | Text of Senate Amendment(s) | |
2009-05-25 | Record vote | |
2009-05-25 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) | |
2009-05-23 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2009-05-23 | Senate Amendments printed and distributed | |
2009-05-22 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-22 | Record vote | |
2009-05-22 | Passed | |
2009-05-22 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-22 | Record vote | |
2009-05-22 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-22 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-22 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-22 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-21 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-20 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-20 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-18 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-05-18 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-18 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-07 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2009-05-07 | Read first time | |
2009-05-06 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-06 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-05 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-05 | Record vote | |
2009-05-05 | Passed | |
2009-05-05 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-05 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-05 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-05 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-05 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-01 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-04-29 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-04-28 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-28 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-27 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-27 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-04-27 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-14 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-14 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-14 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-19 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2009-03-19 | Read first time | |
2009-03-11 | Filed |
Subjects
Electronic Information Systems
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
INTERNET
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
INTERNET
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions