TX HB3648 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-05 - Referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-05 - Referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the composition of the board of directors of the Texas School Safety Center.
Title
Relating to the composition of the board of directors of the Texas School Safety Center.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#791 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-05-02 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-02 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-02 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-02 | House | Record vote RV#791 |
2023-05-02 | House | Passed |
2023-05-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-02 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-02 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-02 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2023-04-28 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2023-04-25 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2023-04-21 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-21 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-13 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-04-13 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2023-04-13 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-16 | House | Referred to Youth Health & Safety, Select |
2023-03-16 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-06 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--Primary & Secondary--Special
Governor
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
SCHOOL SAFETY CENTER, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--Primary & Secondary--Special
Governor
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
SCHOOL SAFETY CENTER, TEXAS