TX HB3721 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-04 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-04 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Summary
Relating to the training and certification of certain members or former members of the military as correctional officers.
Title
Relating to the training and certification of certain members or former members of the military as correctional officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-04 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2009-05-04 | Read first time | |
2009-05-01 | Received from the House | |
2009-04-30 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-30 | Record vote | |
2009-04-30 | Passed | |
2009-04-30 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-29 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2009-04-29 | Amended | |
2009-04-29 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-04-27 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-20 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-18 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-17 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-08 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-08 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-01 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-01 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-01 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-19 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | |
2009-03-19 | Read first time | |
2009-03-12 | Filed |
Subjects
Corrections
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
JAILERS & PRISON GUARDS
Military & Veterans
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
JAILERS & PRISON GUARDS
Military & Veterans