TX HB3745 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the Texas emissions reduction plan fund and account.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the Texas emissions reduction plan fund and account.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-26 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-26 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1978 (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#871 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14 See remarks for effective date
2019-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-29 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-26HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-26SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2019-05-26HouseRecord vote RV#1978
2019-05-26HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2019-05-26HouseHouse adopts resolution to go outside bounds HR 2193
2019-05-26HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2019-05-26SenateRecord vote
2019-05-26SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2019-05-26SenateSenate adopts resolution to go outside bounds SR 848
2019-05-25HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2019-05-25SenateConference committee report filed
2019-05-24HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2019-05-24HouseSenate grants request for conf comm-reported
2019-05-24SenateSenate appoints conferees
2019-05-24SenateSenate grants request for conference comm.
2019-05-23SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2019-05-23SenateHouse requests conference committee-reported
2019-05-23SenateHouse refuses to concur-reported
2019-05-23HouseHouse appoints conferees
2019-05-23HouseHouse requests conference committee
2019-05-23HouseHouse refuses to concur in Senate amendments
2019-05-23HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-23HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-23HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenatePassed
2019-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2019-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22SenateAmended
2019-05-22SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Birdwell
2019-05-22SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-22SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-20SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-17SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-17SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-17SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-15SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-15SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-03SenateReferred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
2019-05-03SenateRead first time
2019-05-02SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-02HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-02HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-02HouseRecord vote RV#871
2019-05-02HousePassed
2019-05-02HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-01HousePassed to engrossment
2019-05-01HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-01HousePlaced on Major State Calendar
2019-04-29HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-24HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-24HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-23HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-18HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-18HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-18HouseVote reconsidered in committee
2019-04-18HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-17HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-17HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-04-17HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-17HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-09HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-09HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-09HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-09HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-09HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-19HouseReferred to Environmental Regulation
2019-03-19HouseRead first time
2019-03-07HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB3745
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB03745I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB03745H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB03745E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB03745S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB03745F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB3745&RcdVtNo=871&Ch=H&Dt=05/02/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-22-F.PDF#page=147
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-22-F.PDF#page=148
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB3745&RcdVtNo=1978&Ch=H&Dt=05/26/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-26-F.PDF#page=19

Bill Comments

feedback