TX HB3757 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-12 - Referred to Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-12 - Referred to Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of a taxing unit other than a school district, county, municipality, or junior college district to establish a limitation on the amount of ad valorem taxes that the taxing unit may impose on the residence homesteads of individuals who are disabled or elderly and their surviving spouses and to the information required to be included in a tax bill.
Title
Relating to the authority of a taxing unit other than a school district, county, municipality, or junior college district to establish a limitation on the amount of ad valorem taxes that the taxing unit may impose on the residence homesteads of individuals who are disabled or elderly and their surviving spouses and to the information required to be included in a tax bill.
Sponsors
Rep. Terry Wilson [R] | Rep. Richard Raymond [D] | Rep. Eddie Morales [D] | Rep. Josey Garcia [D] |
Rep. Caroline Harris [R] | Rep. Carrie Isaac [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1497 (Y: 131 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - House - Amended RV#1457 (Y: 132 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - House - Amended RV#1457 (Y: 132 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-05-11 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-11 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-11 | House | Record vote RV#1497 |
2023-05-11 | House | Passed |
2023-05-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-10 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-10 | House | Record vote RV#1457 |
2023-05-10 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2023-05-10 | House | Amended 2-Darby |
2023-05-10 | House | Amended 1-Wilson |
2023-05-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-05-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-27 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-27 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-24 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-24 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-24 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-20 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2023-03-20 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB830 (Same As) 2023-03-01 - Referred to Local Government
HB1083 (Same As) 2023-03-02 - Referred to Ways & Means
SB830 (Same As) 2023-03-01 - Referred to Local Government
HJR153 (Enabling for) 2023-05-11 - Referred to Local Government
HB1083 (Same As) 2023-03-02 - Referred to Ways & Means
SB830 (Same As) 2023-03-01 - Referred to Local Government
HJR153 (Enabling for) 2023-05-11 - Referred to Local Government
Subjects
Aging
Disabilities, Persons with
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Disabilities, Persons with
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Taxation--Property-Exemptions