TX HB3782 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-10 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-10 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the major events and events trust fund.
Title
Relating to the major events and events trust fund.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Isaac [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-10 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-10 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-26 | House | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development |
2013-03-26 | House | Correction in referral |
2013-03-25 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2013-03-25 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Amusements, Games, Sports
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=83R&Bill=HB3782 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/83R/billtext/html/HB03782I.htm |