TX HB381 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to eligibility for the Texas Peace Officers' Memorial Monument.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to eligibility for the Texas Peace Officers' Memorial Monument.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - Read 3rd time RV#320 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-05-25 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-16 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-16SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-16HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-15HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-15HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-15SenateRecord vote
2019-05-15SenatePassed
2019-05-15SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-15SenateRecord vote
2019-05-15SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-15SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-15SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-15SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-15SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-13SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-09SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-09SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-09SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-08SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-08SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-08SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-17SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2019-04-17SenateRead first time
2019-04-15SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-12HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-12HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-12HouseRecord vote RV#320
2019-04-12HousePassed
2019-04-12HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-12HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-12HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-12HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-12HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-03-22HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-03-20HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-03-20HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-12HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-12HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-03-12HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-12HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-05HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-05HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-05HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-05HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-05HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-19HouseReferred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
2019-02-19HouseRead first time
2018-11-16HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback