TX HB387 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-10 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-10 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of general-law municipalities to restrict sex offenders from child safety zones in the municipality.
Title
Relating to the authority of general-law municipalities to restrict sex offenders from child safety zones in the municipality.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-02 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-25 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-28 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-28 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-28 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-28 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to Urban Affairs |
2017-02-16 | House | Read first time |
2016-11-16 | House | Filed |
Subjects
CHILD SAFETY ZONES
City Government
City Government--General
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
SEXUAL OFFENDERS
City Government
City Government--General
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
SEXUAL OFFENDERS