TX HB3895 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the name of The Woodlands Road Utility District No. 1, of Montgomery County, Texas, and to the administration, powers, and duties of the district.
Title
Relating to the name of The Woodlands Road Utility District No. 1, of Montgomery County, Texas, and to the administration, powers, and duties of the district.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-14 - House - HB 3895Third Reading House (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective immediately | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-26 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-24 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-24 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-23 | House | Senate passage reported |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-05-14 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-05-14 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-14 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-14 | House | Passed |
2013-05-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-14 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2013-05-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-14 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2013-05-13 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2013-05-02 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-05-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-25 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-25 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-04-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-25 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2013-04-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-23 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-23 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-04-23 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-23 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-04-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-25 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2013-03-25 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-21 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Elections
Elections--Election Officers
HARRIS COUNTY
MONTGOMERY COUNTY
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
WOODLANDS ROAD UTILITY DISTRICT NO. 1
Elections--Election Officers
HARRIS COUNTY
MONTGOMERY COUNTY
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
WOODLANDS ROAD UTILITY DISTRICT NO. 1