TX HB3955 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the functions of the Texas Department of Transportation relating to transportation planning and projects.
Title
Relating to the functions of the Texas Department of Transportation relating to transportation planning and projects.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-02 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-02 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-03 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2017-04-03 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Highways
INTERNET
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Transportation
TRANSPORTATION COMMISSION, TEXAS
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Transportation--Miscellaneous
INTERNET
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Transportation
TRANSPORTATION COMMISSION, TEXAS
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Transportation--Miscellaneous
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB3955 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB03955I.htm |