TX HB4010 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the filing of a degree plan by students at public institutions of higher education.
Title
Relating to the filing of a degree plan by students at public institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2019-03-21 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1324 (Same As) 2019-06-04 - Effective immediately
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Junior College Districts
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Junior College Districts
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB4010 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB04010I.htm |