TX HB408 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-03 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-03 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the issuance of Army of Occupation Medal specialty license plates; providing an exemption from a fee.
Title
Relating to the issuance of Army of Occupation Medal specialty license plates; providing an exemption from a fee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2019-05-03 | House | Companion considered in lieu of SB 225 |
2019-05-03 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-04-30 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-04-15 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-08 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs |
2019-02-20 | House | Read first time |
2018-11-26 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB225 (Same As) 2019-05-20 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
AWARDS, MEDALS, PRIZES
LICENSE PLATES
Military & Veterans
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
LICENSE PLATES
Military & Veterans
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration