TX HB4145 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the prescription of a controlled substance to certain patients for the treatment of pain.
Title
Relating to the prescription of a controlled substance to certain patients for the treatment of pain.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-05-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-01 | House | Recalled from subcommittee |
2019-05-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-29 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-03-25 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB4145 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB04145I.htm |