TX HB4198 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the exclusion from total revenue of certain payments made by a performing rights society for purposes of computing the franchise tax.
Title
Relating to the exclusion from total revenue of certain payments made by a performing rights society for purposes of computing the franchise tax.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Murphy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-10 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2019-03-25 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1824 (Similar To) 2019-06-04 - Effective immediately
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB4198 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB04198I.htm |