TX HB4321 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-14 - Recommendations filed with the Speaker
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-14 - Recommendations filed with the Speaker
Summary
Relating to the authority of the Upper Trinity Groundwater Conservation District to establish discounted production fee rates for certain municipalities.
Title
Relating to the authority of the Upper Trinity Groundwater Conservation District to establish discounted production fee rates for certain municipalities.
Sponsors
Sen. Phil King [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-14 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | |
2009-03-24 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2009-03-24 | Read first time | |
2009-03-16 | Transmitted to the Governor | |
2009-03-13 | Filed |
Subjects
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Groundwater Conserve Dist.
UPPER TRINITY GROUNDWATER CONSERVATION DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities--Groundwater Conserve Dist.
UPPER TRINITY GROUNDWATER CONSERVATION DISTRICT