TX HB4324 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the submission and use of electronic student records in the electronic student records system.
Title
Relating to the submission and use of electronic student records in the electronic student records system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-07 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-30 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-24 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-24 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-23 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-23 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-03-25 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Electronic Information Systems
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Electronic Information Systems
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB4324 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB04324I.htm |