TX HB4348 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-21 - Referred to Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-21 - Referred to Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the right to try cutting-edge treatments for patients with life-threatening or severely debilitating illnesses.
Title
Relating to the right to try cutting-edge treatments for patients with life-threatening or severely debilitating illnesses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-21 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2023-03-21 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1580 (Same As) 2023-03-16 - Referred to Health & Human Services
HB4059 (Same As) 2023-05-11 - Referred to Health & Human Services
SB1580 (Same As) 2023-03-16 - Referred to Health & Human Services
HB4059 (Same As) 2023-05-11 - Referred to Health & Human Services
SB1580 (Same As) 2023-03-16 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Subjects
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health Care Providers
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
INFORMED CONSENT
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
PARENTAL CONSENT
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health Care Providers
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
INFORMED CONSENT
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
PARENTAL CONSENT
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=HB4348 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/HB04348I.htm |