TX HB4380 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-03 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-03 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of the Environmental Task Force Advisory Committee.
Title
Relating to the creation of the Environmental Task Force Advisory Committee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-29 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-29 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to Energy Resources |
2019-03-25 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Environment
Environment--General
Mines & Mineral Resources
Oil & Gas
RAILROAD COMMISSION
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Utilities
Utilities--Natural Gas
Environment--General
Mines & Mineral Resources
Oil & Gas
RAILROAD COMMISSION
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Utilities
Utilities--Natural Gas
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB4380 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB04380I.htm |