TX HB4386 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-26 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-26 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain improvements of the state highway system in certain census tracts.
Title
Relating to certain improvements of the state highway system in certain census tracts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-21 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2023-03-21 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1450 (Same As) 2023-03-16 - Referred to Transportation
SB1450 (Same As) 2023-03-16 - Referred to Transportation
SB1450 (Same As) 2023-03-16 - Referred to Transportation