TX HB4444 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-12 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-12 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Summary
Relating to the election of the speaker of the house of representatives; providing criminal penalties.
Title
Relating to the election of the speaker of the house of representatives; providing criminal penalties.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Dunnam [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-12 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-11 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-11 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-07 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-07 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-05-07 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-20 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-20 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-20 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-20 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-25 | Referred to Elections | |
2009-03-25 | Read first time | |
2009-03-13 | Filed |
Subjects
Corporations & Associations
Elections
Elections--Campaign Financing
ETHICS COMMISSION, TEXAS
Legislature
POLITICAL CONTRIBUTIONS
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
Elections
Elections--Campaign Financing
ETHICS COMMISSION, TEXAS
Legislature
POLITICAL CONTRIBUTIONS
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE