TX HB445 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on June 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on June 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to providing notice of the availability of paid leave for military service to public officers and employees.
Title
Relating to providing notice of the availability of paid leave for military service to public officers and employees.
Sponsors
Rep. John Raney [R] | Rep. Susan King [R] | Rep. Wayne Smith [R] | Rep. Joe Farias [D] |
Rep. Kenneth Sheets [R] | Sen. Pat Fallon [R] | Rep. Rick Miller [R] | Rep. Leighton Schubert [R] |
Sen. Eddie Lucio [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-22 - House - HB 445Third Reading House (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-15 | Effective on 9/1/15 | |
2015-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-24 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-23 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-22 | House | Senate passage reported |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Vet Affairs & Military Installations |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-04-22 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-22 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-22 | House | Passed |
2015-04-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-21 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-04-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-21 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-04-16 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-07 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-07 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-07 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-03-18 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-03-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-03-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-02-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-02-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-02-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-02-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs |
2015-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2014-12-04 | House | Filed |