TX HB4460 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - No action taken in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - No action taken in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain technical violations of conditions of community supervision.
Title
Relating to certain technical violations of conditions of community supervision.
Sponsors
Rep. Alma Allen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | No action taken in committee |
2019-04-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-18 | House | No action taken in committee |
2019-04-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to Corrections |
2019-03-26 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Corrections
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB4460 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB04460I.htm |