TX HB4504 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . January 1, 2025
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . January 1, 2025
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the nonsubstantive revision of certain provisions of the Code of Criminal Procedure, including conforming amendments.
Title
Relating to the nonsubstantive revision of certain provisions of the Code of Criminal Procedure, including conforming amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-19 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1887 (Y: 137 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#791 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#791 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-12 | Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . January 1, 2025 | |
2023-06-12 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-22 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-20 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-19 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2023-05-19 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2023-05-19 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-19 | House | Record vote RV#1887 |
2023-05-19 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2023-05-18 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2023-05-18 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2023-05-18 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Passed |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Amended |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Johnson |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Ordered not printed |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Administration |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-05-02 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-02 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-02 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-02 | House | Record vote RV#791 |
2023-05-02 | House | Passed |
2023-05-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-02 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-02 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-02 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2023-04-28 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2023-04-27 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2023-04-27 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-21 | House | Printing rule suspended |
2023-04-20 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-04-20 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2023-04-20 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-19 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-19 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-19 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-22 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2023-03-22 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
COMMISSION ON LAW ENFORCEMENT, TEXAS
Courts
Courts--General
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Family
Family--Child Protection
Law Enforcement
PEACE OFFICERS
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Statutory Revision
Weapons
Courts
Courts--General
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Family
Family--Child Protection
Law Enforcement
PEACE OFFICERS
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Statutory Revision
Weapons