TX HB4517 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of a work group on blockchain matters concerning this state.
Title
Relating to the creation of a work group on blockchain matters concerning this state.
Sponsors
Sen. Tan Parker [R] | Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R] | Rep. Scott Sanford [R] | Sen. Phil King [R] |
Rep. Lyle Larson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services |
2019-03-26 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
COMPUTERS & SOFTWARE
CURRENCY & CURRENCY EXCHANGE
Electronic Information Systems
Governor
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
Science & Technology
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
CURRENCY & CURRENCY EXCHANGE
Electronic Information Systems
Governor
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
Science & Technology
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE