TX HB4632 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-16 - Recommendations filed with the Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-16 - Recommendations filed with the Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the Red River Authority, following recommendations of the Sunset Advisory Commission.
Title
Relating to the Red River Authority, following recommendations of the Sunset Advisory Commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | House | Recommendations filed with the Speaker |
2019-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2019-03-26 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-14 | House | Transmitted to the Governor |
2019-03-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB627 (Same As) 2019-05-07 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
AUDITOR, STATE
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Governor
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
RED RIVER AUTHORITY OF TEXAS
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--River Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Sunset—Required Reviews
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Governor
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
RED RIVER AUTHORITY OF TEXAS
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--River Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Sunset—Required Reviews
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB4632 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB04632I.htm |