TX HB4659 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of the City of Kemah Municipal Management District No. 1 to provide water and sewer service, exercise certain powers, issue bonds, and impose fees, taxes, and assessments and to the validation of certain acts and proceedings of the district.
Title
Relating to the authority of the City of Kemah Municipal Management District No. 1 to provide water and sewer service, exercise certain powers, issue bonds, and impose fees, taxes, and assessments and to the validation of certain acts and proceedings of the district.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1090 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1090 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-15 | Effective immediately | |
2021-06-15 | Filed without the Governor's signature | |
2021-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-31 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-30 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate passage reported |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-14 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-14 | House | Recommendations filed with the Speaker |
2021-05-14 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-14 | House | Record vote RV#1090 |
2021-05-14 | House | Passed |
2021-05-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-14 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-14 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-05-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-14 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-05-07 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-05-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-04 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-05-04 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-05-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-30 | House | Referred to Urban Affairs |
2021-04-30 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-28 | House | Transmitted to the Governor |
2021-04-28 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2228 (Same As) 2021-05-14 - Recommendations filed with the Senate
SB2228 (Same As) 2021-05-14 - Recommendations filed with the Senate
SB2228 (Same As) 2021-05-14 - Recommendations filed with the Senate
Subjects
CITY OF KEMAH MUNICIPAL MANAGEMENT DISTRICT NO. 1
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous