TX HB4665 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the juvenile board of Fayette County.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the juvenile board of Fayette County.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1361 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-05-15SenateRead first time
2019-05-15SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-14HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-14HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-14HouseRecord vote RV#1361
2019-05-14HousePassed
2019-05-14HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-14HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-14HousePassed to engrossment
2019-05-14HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-14HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-05-10HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-05-09HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-05-08HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-08HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-02HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-02HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-05-02HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-01HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-05-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-01HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-01HouseReferred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
2019-04-01HouseRead first time
2019-03-25HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback