TX HB496 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to traumatic injury response protocol and the use of bleeding control stations in public schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to traumatic injury response protocol and the use of bleeding control stations in public schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-26 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-26 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#2007 (Y: 124 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1335 (Y: 91 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - Amended RV#1251 (Y: 98 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-15 Effective immediately
2019-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-29 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-27HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-26SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2019-05-26HouseRecord vote RV#2007
2019-05-26HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2019-05-26HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2019-05-26SenateRecord vote
2019-05-26SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2019-05-25HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2019-05-25SenateConference committee report filed
2019-05-24HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2019-05-24HouseSenate grants request for conf comm-reported
2019-05-24SenateSenate appoints conferees
2019-05-24SenateSenate grants request for conference comm.
2019-05-23SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2019-05-23SenateHouse requests conference committee-reported
2019-05-23SenateHouse refuses to concur-reported
2019-05-23HouseHouse appoints conferees
2019-05-23HouseHouse requests conference committee
2019-05-23HouseHouse refuses to concur in Senate amendments
2019-05-22HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-22HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-21HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-21SenateRecord vote
2019-05-21SenatePassed
2019-05-21SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-21SenateRecord vote
2019-05-21SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-21SenateRecord vote
2019-05-21SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2019-05-21SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-21SenateAmendment adopted as amended FA1 Fallon
2019-05-21SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-21SenateAmendment amended
2019-05-21SenateAmendment to amendment offered FA1 Fallon
2019-05-21SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Lucio
2019-05-21SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-21SenateRecord vote
2019-05-21SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-21SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-20SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-17SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-17SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-16SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-16SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-14SenateReferred to Education
2019-05-14SenateRead first time
2019-05-13SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-13HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-10HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-10HouseRecord vote RV#1335
2019-05-10HousePassed
2019-05-10HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-09HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-09HouseRecord vote RV#1251
2019-05-09HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-05-09HouseAmended 1-Gervin-Hawkins
2019-05-09HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-09HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-07HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-29HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-28HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-26HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-18HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-18HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-18HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-16HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-16HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-16HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-16HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-16HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-20HouseReferred to Public Education
2019-02-20HouseRead first time
2018-12-10HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB496
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00496I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00496H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00496E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00496S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00496F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB496&RcdVtNo=1251&Ch=H&Dt=05/09/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB496&RcdVtNo=1335&Ch=H&Dt=05/10/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-21-F.PDF#page=105
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-21-F.PDF#page=106
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-21-F.PDF#page=107
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB496&RcdVtNo=2007&Ch=H&Dt=05/26/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-26-F.PDF#page=23

Bill Comments

feedback