TX HB5077 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-23 - Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
Pending: House Homeland Security & Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-23 - Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
Pending: House Homeland Security & Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to licensure and training requirements for school marshals.
Title
Relating to licensure and training requirements for school marshals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2023-03-23 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2407 (Same As) 2023-05-23 - Placed on General State Calendar
SB1475 (Similar To) 2023-04-28 - Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
SB1475 (Similar To) 2023-04-28 - Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Law Enforcement
LAW ENFORCEMENT, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
TEXAS STATE UNIVERSITY
TEXAS STATE UNIVERSITY--SAN MARCOS
Weapons
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Law Enforcement
LAW ENFORCEMENT, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
TEXAS STATE UNIVERSITY
TEXAS STATE UNIVERSITY--SAN MARCOS
Weapons
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=HB5077 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/HB05077I.htm |