TX HB5250 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-12 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-12 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to fees on and grants for fuel ethanol, renewable methane, biodiesel, and renewable diesel.
Title
Relating to fees on and grants for fuel ethanol, renewable methane, biodiesel, and renewable diesel.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-12 | House | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. |
2023-05-12 | House | Withdrawn from calendar (by author) |
2023-05-12 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2023-05-10 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2023-05-09 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2023-05-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-05-04 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-05-04 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2023-05-04 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-05-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-12 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-12 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-24 | House | Referred to Agriculture & Livestock |
2023-03-24 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Agriculture
ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT & TOURISM OFFICE, TEXAS
Energy
Energy--Alternative Fuels
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
Statutory Revision
ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT & TOURISM OFFICE, TEXAS
Energy
Energy--Alternative Fuels
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
Statutory Revision