TX HB569 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-9)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-9)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to credit toward payment of a fine and costs for certain misdemeanants confined in jail or prison before sentencing.
Title
Relating to credit toward payment of a fine and costs for certain misdemeanants confined in jail or prison before sentencing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-18 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1239 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#201 (Y: 148 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#201 (Y: 148 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-15 | Effective on 9/1/21 | |
2021-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-05-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-19 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-18 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-18 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2021-05-18 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2021-05-18 | House | Record vote RV#1239 |
2021-05-18 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2021-05-13 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2021-05-13 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2021-05-13 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Amended |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 West |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-14 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-14 | House | Record vote RV#201 |
2021-04-14 | House | Passed |
2021-04-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-13 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-04-13 | House | Amended 1-Sanford |
2021-04-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-13 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-09 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-03-22 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-03-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2021-03-01 | House | Read first time |
2020-11-13 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB192 (Same As) 2021-03-23 - Co-author authorized
Subjects
BONTON FARMS ACT
Corrections
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
Courts
Courts--Judges
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Corrections
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
Courts
Courts--Judges
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment