TX HB574 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on December 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-10 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-10 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a limitation on the authority to arrest a person for certain misdemeanors punishable by a fine only.
Title
Relating to a limitation on the authority to arrest a person for certain misdemeanors punishable by a fine only.
Sponsors
Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D] | Rep. James White [R] | Rep. Eric Johnson [D] | Rep. Eugene Wu [D] |
Rep. Garnet Coleman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-04 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-03 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-03-21 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-21 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-21 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2017-03-09 | House | Correction in referral |
2017-03-01 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2017-03-01 | House | Read first time |
2016-12-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Law Enforcement
LAW ENFORCEMENT, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
PEACE OFFICERS
Criminal Procedure--General
Law Enforcement
LAW ENFORCEMENT, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
PEACE OFFICERS