TX HB623 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-06 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-06 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Summary
Relating to the regulation of massage establishments in certain counties.
Title
Relating to the regulation of massage establishments in certain counties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-06 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2009-05-06 | Read first time | |
2009-05-04 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-02 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-01 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-01 | Record vote | |
2009-05-01 | Passed | |
2009-05-01 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-01 | Record vote | |
2009-05-01 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-01 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-01 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-01 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-04-29 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-21 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-20 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-20 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-14 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-14 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-07 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-07 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-07 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-07 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-07 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-18 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2009-02-18 | Read first time | |
2009-01-14 | Filed |
Subjects
MASSAGE THERAPY & MASSAGE THERAPISTS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations