TX HB634 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-11 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-11 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to toll project information provided by the Texas Department of Transportation.
Title
Relating to toll project information provided by the Texas Department of Transportation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-11 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-11 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-11 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-20 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | |
2011-04-20 | Read first time | |
2011-04-13 | Received from the House | |
2011-04-12 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-12 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-12 | Record vote | |
2011-04-12 | Passed | |
2011-04-12 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-11 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-11 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-11 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-04-06 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-03-23 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-03-21 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-03-21 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-03-16 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-03-16 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-09 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-09 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-09 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-09 | No action taken in committee | |
2011-03-09 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-21 | Referred to Transportation | |
2011-02-21 | Read first time | |
2011-01-12 | Filed |