TX HB638 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the issuance of posthumous high school diplomas to certain students.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the issuance of posthumous high school diplomas to certain students.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-13 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Read 3rd time RV#96 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23 Effective immediately
2019-05-23 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-14 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-14SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-14HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-13HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-13HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-13SenateRecord vote
2019-05-13SenatePassed
2019-05-13SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-13SenateRecord vote
2019-05-13SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-13SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-13SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-13SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-09SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-09SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-07SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-07SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-07SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-07SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-07SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-07SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-02SenateReferred to Education
2019-04-02SenateRead first time
2019-04-01SenateReceived from the House
2019-03-27HouseReported engrossed
2019-03-27HouseRecord vote RV#96
2019-03-27HousePassed
2019-03-27HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-26HousePassed to engrossment
2019-03-26HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-26HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-03-21HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-13HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-12HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-03-12HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-03-11HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-06HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-06HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-06HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-02-26HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-02-26HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-02-26HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-02-26HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-02-26HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-21HouseReferred to Public Education
2019-02-21HouseRead first time
2019-01-03HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback