TX HB639 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of an emergency services district to provide preventive health care services.
Title
Relating to the authority of an emergency services district to provide preventive health care services.
Sponsors
Rep. James White [R] | Rep. Philip Cortez [D] | Rep. Tom Oliverson [R] | Rep. Ray Lopez [D] |
Rep. William Metcalf [R] | Rep. Andrew Murr [R] | Rep. Chris Paddie [R] | Sen. Charles Schwertner [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1189 (Y: 117 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 21) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | Senate | Removed from local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-16 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-14 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-14 | House | Record vote RV#1189 |
2021-05-14 | House | Passed |
2021-05-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-13 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-05-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-13 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-13 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2021-03-01 | House | Read first time |
2020-11-24 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1337 (Same As) 2021-03-18 - Referred to Local Government
Subjects
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous