TX HB685 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Placed on local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to immunity from liability of a court clerk and county for the disclosure or release of certain court documents and information contained in the court documents.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to immunity from liability of a court clerk and county for the disclosure or release of certain court documents and information contained in the court documents.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#577 (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-10SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-10SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-10SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-09SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-09SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-09SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-25SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-04-25SenateRead first time
2019-04-24SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-24HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-24HouseRecord vote RV#577
2019-04-24HousePassed
2019-04-24HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-23HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-23HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-23HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-18HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-05HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-02HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-01HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-01HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-13HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-13HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-13HouseVote reconsidered in committee
2019-03-13HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-11HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-11HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-11HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-04HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-04HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-04HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-04HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-04HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-21HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2019-02-21HouseRead first time
2019-01-08HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB2374 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - Referred to State Affairs

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback