TX HB71 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-04 - Referred to Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-04 - Referred to Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the establishment of a program for the issuance of digital identification.
Title
Relating to the establishment of a program for the issuance of digital identification.
Sponsors
Rep. Terry Canales [D] | Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R] | Rep. Oscar Longoria [D] | Rep. Briscoe Cain [R] |
Rep. Tony Tinderholt [R] | Rep. Penny Morales Shaw [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-01 - House - Read 3rd time RV#760 (Y: 120 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - House - Amended RV#745 (Y: 121 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - House - Amended RV#745 (Y: 121 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-05-01 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-01 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-01 | House | Record vote RV#760 |
2023-05-01 | House | Passed |
2023-05-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-28 | House | Record vote RV#745 |
2023-04-28 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2023-04-28 | House | Amended 1-Toth, Cain, and Vasut |
2023-04-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-28 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-04-26 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-18 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-11 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-30 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-30 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-03-30 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-03-28 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-28 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-03-28 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-28 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-28 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-02-23 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2023-02-23 | House | Read first time |
2022-11-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB1783 (Same As) 2023-03-07 - Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
HB1783 (Same As) 2023-03-07 - Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
HB1783 (Same As) 2023-03-07 - Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
Subjects
Electronic Information Systems
EMAIL & ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATIONS
IDENTIFICATION CARDS
Parks & Wildlife
Parks & Wildlife--Licenses
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
EMAIL & ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATIONS
IDENTIFICATION CARDS
Parks & Wildlife
Parks & Wildlife--Licenses
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses