TX HB714 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-19 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a reemployment program available to certain veterans placed on community supervision for a misdemeanor offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a reemployment program available to certain veterans placed on community supervision for a misdemeanor offense.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#962 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-19SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-17SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-17SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-17SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-15SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-05-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-07SenateReferred to Vet Affairs & Border Security
2019-05-07SenateRead first time
2019-05-06SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-04HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-03HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-03HouseRecord vote RV#962
2019-05-03HousePassed
2019-05-03HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-03HousePassed to engrossment
2019-05-03HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-03HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-04-30HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-04-23HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-04-18HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-18HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-17HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-17HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-04-17HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-15HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-15HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-15HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-15HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-21HouseReferred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
2019-02-21HouseRead first time
2019-01-10HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback