TX HB850 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Business & Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the prohibition of employment discrimination based on sexual orientation or gender identity or expression.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the prohibition of employment discrimination based on sexual orientation or gender identity or expression.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-02HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-02HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-02HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-25HouseReferred to Business & Industry
2019-02-25HouseRead first time
2019-01-16HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1250 (Same As) 2019-04-01 - Co-author authorized

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback