TX HB861 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-20 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-20 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the processing and sale of kratom and kratom products; providing civil penalties; creating a criminal offense.
Title
Relating to the processing and sale of kratom and kratom products; providing civil penalties; creating a criminal offense.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2023-04-20 | House | Companion considered in lieu of SB 497 |
2023-04-13 | House | Postponed 4/20/23 10:00 AM |
2023-04-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-13 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-04-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-03-23 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-03-23 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-03-22 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-03-20 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-01 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2023-03-01 | House | Read first time |
2022-12-01 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Drugs
FOOD
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--General
PACKAGING & LABELING REQUIREMENTS
Safety
TEXAS KRATOM CONSUMER HEALTH AND SAFETY PROTECTION ACT
Crimes--Drugs
FOOD
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--General
PACKAGING & LABELING REQUIREMENTS
Safety
TEXAS KRATOM CONSUMER HEALTH AND SAFETY PROTECTION ACT