TX HB992 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Passed on June 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-17 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Passed on June 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-17 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the exemption from ad valorem taxation of the total appraised value of the residence homestead of the surviving spouse of a 100 percent or totally disabled veteran.
Title
Relating to the exemption from ad valorem taxation of the total appraised value of the residence homestead of the surviving spouse of a 100 percent or totally disabled veteran.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-23 - House - HB 992Third Reading House (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-17 | See remarks for effective date | |
2015-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-26 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-25 | House | Senate passage reported |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-04-24 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-23 | House | Reason for vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-23 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-23 | House | Passed |
2015-04-23 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2015-04-23 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-04-23 | House | Postponed |
2015-04-23 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-04-23 | House | Postponed |
2015-04-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-22 | House | Reason for vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-22 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-22 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-04-22 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-04-16 | House | Postponed |
2015-04-16 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-16 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-04-14 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-06 | House | Transferred to Calendars Committee |
2015-04-06 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2015-04-06 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-04-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-02 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-04-02 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-04-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-02 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2015-03-02 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-28 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HJR75 (Enabling for) 2015-05-28 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Subjects
Disabilities, Persons with
Military & Veterans
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Military & Veterans
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions