TX HCR102 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
In memory of Fire Chief Curtis Dewayne Brown of the Dalhart Fire Department.
Title
In memory of Fire Chief Curtis Dewayne Brown of the Dalhart Fire Department.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-24 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-04-12 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-04-10 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-04-06 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-04-06 | House | Senate passage reported |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Read & adopted |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-04-05 | House | Adopted |
2023-04-05 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-04-04 | House | Filed |