TX HCR115 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring the Battleship Texas Foundation for its work to preserve the historic battleship.
Title
Honoring the Battleship Texas Foundation for its work to preserve the historic battleship.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-29 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-28 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-28 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-27 | Senate passage reported | |
2011-05-27 | Read & adopted | |
2011-04-26 | Received from the House | |
2011-04-21 | Adopted | |
2011-04-21 | Laid before the House | |
2011-04-21 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2011-04-19 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2011-04-13 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2011-03-17 | Filed |